Hu, Weimin (CPSO#: 66199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Hebei Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 2011
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Hu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hu ( CPSO# 66199 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
1403B - 100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEIMIN HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1998