Hu, William (CPSO#: 55447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Hu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hu ( CPSO# 55447 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Dec 2009 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 1, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Hu, in
            accordance with the undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  
                  (a)   Dr. Hu's practice is primarily limited to surgical assists and only
                        when a certified surgeon or another qualified physician is
                        performing the surgery and in attendance;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Hu will limit his clinical practice to his existing patients
                        and will not practice in a clinic or private office setting.