Huang, Annie (CPSO#: 69132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hakka, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Hematology-Oncology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7360
Fax: (416) 813-8024
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 17 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1999