Huang, Eileen Yi-Li (CPSO#: 29916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0348
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Hospital
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eileen Yi-Li Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Huang ( CPSO# 29916 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN YI-LI HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1978