Huang, Erwin Ping-Shen (CPSO#: 21142)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Medical College of Shanghai, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005