Huang, Harvey Yu-Zen (CPSO#: 69365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Huang, Harvey (used until: 18 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Ajax and Pickering Health Centre
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1288
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Huang ( CPSO# 69365 )

Business Address:
Ajax and Pickering Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (416) 334-5003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARVEY YU-ZEN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000