Huang, Henry (CPSO#: 72811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 428-8862
Fax: (905) 427-9174
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-8862
Fax: (905) 427-9174
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Huang ( CPSO# 72811 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 428-8862

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998