Huang, Jane (CPSO#: 60979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Names: Huang-Nathens, Jane (used until: 03 Dec 2012 )     Huang, Jane (used until: 15 Apr 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Huang ( CPSO# 60979 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990