Huang, Lennox Hungchia (CPSO#: 81871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6891
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lennox Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Huang ( CPSO# 81871 )

Business Address:
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 1410
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Sep 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lennox Hungchia Huang may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Huang holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  as an associate staff member at McMaster's Children's Hospital, and
                  
                  (iii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Huang no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.