Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Huang, Lucy Yi-Wen (CPSO#: 29917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Alberta Hospital
Dept Of Anaesthesia & Pain Medicine
8440 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-8861
Fax: (780) 407-3200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCY YI-WEN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1978