Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Huang, Madeline Wan Cheng (CPSO#: 62462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 499-3559
Fax: (416) 499-4631
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MWC Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang ( CPSO# 62462 )

Business Address:
Suite LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940

Business Address:
491 Lawrence Avenue West (Basement)
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9375

Business Address:
Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 499-3559

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELINE WAN CHENG HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991