Huang, Pein-Pein (CPSO#: 50801)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Manchester, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pein-Pein Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 1708 - 90 George St. Ottawa, ON K1N 0A8
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017