Huang, Qingli Lily (CPSO#: 70427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 338-0550
Fax: (905) 338-3187
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.Q. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Huang ( CPSO# 70427 )

Business Address:
Unit 580
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 338-0550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QINGLI LILY HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2000