Huang, Shao-Nan (CPSO#: 41028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Mar 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAO-NAN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1983