Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Huang, Yi-Ping (CPSO#: 56382)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai First Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1987