Huang, Yu Lun (CPSO#: 70901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
181 Green Lane East (unit #2)
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

17215 Leslie St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yu Lun Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang ( CPSO# 70901 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 868-9243

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YU LUN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 1996 to 10 Dec 1996
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1997