Huard, Genevieve (CPSO#: 69862)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001