Hubbes, Claudia (CPSO#: 65520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Hubbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hubbes ( CPSO# 65520 )

Business Address:
309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone Number: (613) 724-5852

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA HUBBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993