Huckell, Cameron Bruce (CPSO#: 57486)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013