Huckell, Graham Richmond (CPSO#: 53138)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2005