Hucker, Stephen John Charman (CPSO#: 42306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#101
427 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5S9
Phone: (416) 533-6455
Fax: (416) 533-6455
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Hucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hucker ( CPSO# 42306 )

Business Address:
101 - 427 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5S9
Phone Number: (416) 533-6455

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN CHARMAN HUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUCKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987