Huculak, George Erast (CPSO#: 62811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
320 Byron Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone: (905) 668-5835
Fax: (905) 668-8942
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Huculak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Huculak ( CPSO# 62811 )

Business Address:
200 - 320 Byron Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 668-5835

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ERAST HUCULAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUCULAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1992