Huda, Sayyid Shamsul (CPSO#: 23821)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2011