Hudak, Alan Patrick (CPSO#: 53518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone: (705) 327-9188
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan P. Hudak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hudak ( CPSO# 53518 )

Business Address:
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN PATRICK HUDAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1983