Hudoba De Badyn, Peter (CPSO#: 64495)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Hudoba, Peter (used until: 19 Jan 1995 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Comenius, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000