Hudon, Camille Laurence (CPSO#: 110726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury And District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camille Hudon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hudon ( CPSO# 110726)

Business Address:
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILLE LAURENCE HUDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016