Hudson, Craig James (CPSO#: 59713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5700
100 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C7
Phone: (416) 421-7445
Fax: (866) 702-1989
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig James Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hudson ( CPSO# 59713 )

Business Address:
5700 - 100 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 421-7445

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG JAMES HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989