Hudson, Lawrence Patrick (CPSO#: 61031)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998