Huebsch, Lothar Bernd (CPSO#: 31452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Department Of Medicine(Haematology)
501 Smyth Road
Room 7208
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8158
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOTHAR BERND HUEBSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUEBSCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1980