Huehn, Linda Lee (CPSO#: 50803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
458 MacLaren Street
Ground Floor
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone: (613) 233-8271
Fax: (613) 230-9204
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA LEE HUEHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUEHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1987