Huff, Hildegard Rosemarie (CPSO#: 31410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1980

Summary

Former Name: Wagner, Hildegard Rosemarie (used until: 15 Jan 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
8th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-3920
Fax: (519) 370-4070
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. R. Huff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Huff ( CPSO# 31410 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-3920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILDEGARD ROSEMARIE HUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1980