Hug, Martin Bernd (CPSO#: 69131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P O Box 2007
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: (519) 631-1825
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Hug Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hug ( CPSO# 69131 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN BERND HUG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997