Huggins, Mary Anne (CPSO#: 47989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
57 Toledo Road
Toronto ON  M9C 2H7
Phone: 416-918-9142
Fax: (416) 626-1477
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANNE HUGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGGINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990