Hugh, Judith Clara (CPSO#: 52960)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1983 to 15 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 2007