Hugh, Sarah Christina (CPSO#: 95752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road
Unit 410
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2630 Rutherford Road
Unit 200
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Canada
Phone: 416-548-4039
Fax: 647-722-5440
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 410
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Christina Hugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hugh ( CPSO# 95752 )

Business Address:
410 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 856-9933

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH CHRISTINA HUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016