Hughes, Carol Mary Eileen (CPSO#: 52678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bloom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hughes ( CPSO# 52678 )
Dr. I. Bloom ( CPSO# 50169 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL MARY EILEEN HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985