Hughes, Edward George (CPSO#: 33249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward and Frances Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984