Hughes, Frances Jean (CPSO#: 53465)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: Keylock, Frances Jean (used until: 18 Nov 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward and Frances Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 409 3155 Harvester Road Burlington ON L7N 3V2 Tel: 905-333-5437
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016