Hughes, Peter Lawrence (CPSO#: 61084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6844
Fax: (705) 740-6897
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter L. Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipcsei ( CPSO# 60788 )
Dr. P. Hughes ( CPSO# 61084 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LAWRENCE HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990