Hughes, William Guy (CPSO#: 31872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1980

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: (705) 743-3555
Fax: (705) 775-3555
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
P.O.Box 459
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

North Hastings Family Health Team
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Northumberland Hill Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hughes ( CPSO# 31872 )

Business Address:
23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7129 Gelert Road
P.O. Box 870, 2nd Floor
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 475-1212

Business Address:
Suite 204
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 743-3555

Business Address:
North Hastings Family Health Team
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GUY HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1980

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with communication with patients.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with College policy on Ending Physician-Patient Relationship.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person in connection with Annual Renewal Form to College.
Download Full Document (PDF)