Hughes-Rafter, Yvonne (CPSO#: 53204)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Rafter, Yvonne (used until: 08 Aug 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 1991