Huh, Caroline Chung-Won (CPSO#: 65211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 410
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 286-3743
Fax: (647) 436-0031
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Huh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 61067 )
Dr. C. Huh ( CPSO# 65211 )

Business Address:
410 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 286-3743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE CHUNG-WON HUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993