Huh, Kun (CPSO#: 106369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline St N, Lindsay
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 3517
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 High St
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3230
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

21 McGivern St W
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: (519) 881-1220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

1199 Queen St N
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Canada
Phone: (519) 396-3331
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUN HUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017