Huh, Susanna (CPSO#: 71321)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1999 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001