Hui, Benjamin King (CPSO#: 89124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 554-8650
Fax: (647) 689-2266
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Hui Medicine Professional

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam ( CPSO# 90927 )
Dr. B. Hui ( CPSO# 89124 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 405
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 554-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN KING HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013