Hui, Catherine Chee Man (CPSO#: 76912)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2002