Hui, Creighton (CPSO#: 88570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4512
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Creighton Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hui ( CPSO# 88570 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 29 May 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 28, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Creighton Hui:

            a)    Dr. Hui will participate in and successfully complete, within 6 months of
                  the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics with
                  an instructor approved by the College, with a report or reports to be
                  provided to the College regarding Dr. Hui's progress and compliance; 

            b)    For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the
                  suspension of his certificate of registration described in paragraph 3,
                  Dr. Hui will, at his own expense, retain a practice monitor approved by
                  the College who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as
                  Schedule "A" (the "Practice Monitor") to review Dr. Hui's Ontario Health
                  Insurance Plan ("OHIP") billings and the corresponding patient records to
                  ensure his compliance with the Health Insurance Act, as follows:

                  i.    In respect of Dr. Hui's Emergency Medicine practice, the Practice
                        Monitor will review once every month Dr. Hui's ER triage records
                        and the associated billings submitted to OHIP for a minimum of ten
                        percent (10%) of Dr. Hui's patient encounters;
                  
                  ii.   In respect of any house call practice of Dr. Hui during the
                        one-year period of monitoring, Dr. Hui will notify the College if
                        he resumes providing house calls, in which case the Practice
                        Monitor will review once every month Dr. Hui's patient records and
                        the associated billings submitted to OHIP for a minimum of
                        twenty-five percent (25%) of Dr. Hui's patient encounters or, if
                        Dr. Hui's house call practice volume is greater than a volume of
                        approximately 30-50 patients per month, a reasonable number or
                        percentage of patient records to be determined by the College based
                        on the volume of Dr. Hui's house call practice when resumed;
                  
                  iii.  In respect of any other practice of Dr. Hui during the one-year
                        period of monitoring, Dr. Hui will notify the College prior to
                        commencing such practice and the Practice Monitor will review once
                        every month a reasonable number or percentage of Dr. Hui's patient
                        records and associated billings submitted to OHIP in respect of
                        this practice, with the number or percentage of patient records to
                        be determined by the College based on the volume of this practice
                        once known;    
                  
                  iv.   The Practice Monitor will be solely responsible for randomly
                        selecting the patient records to be reviewed in accordance with
                        paragraph 4b of this Order;
                  
                  v.    Dr. Hui shall provide his Practice Monitor with his monthly OHIP
                        reconciliation from all Practice Locations, as defined below, and
                        the Practice Monitor shall review the reconciliation;
                  
                  
            c)    If a Practice Monitor who has given an undertaking in Schedule "A" to
                  this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr.
                  Hui shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time;

            d)    If Dr. Hui is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor in accordance with the
                  terms of this Order, he shall cease to remit billings to OHIP until such
                  time as he has done so;

            e)    Dr. Hui shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor to the
                  College, and by the College to his Practice Monitor, of all information
                  the Practice Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order
                  to fulfill the Practice Monitor's undertaking and to monitor Dr. Hui's
                  compliance with this Order;

            f)    For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the
                  suspension of his certificate of registration described in paragraph 3,
                  Dr. Hui shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices including, but not limited to hospitals, clinics, and offices,
                  in any jurisdiction (collectively, his "Practice Location(s)"), within
                  fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and
                  all new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that
                  location, for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order;

            g)    For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the
                  suspension of his certificate of registration described in paragraph 3,
                  Dr. Hui shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections
                  of his Practice Location(s) and patient records by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this
                  Order;

            h)    Dr. Hui shall provide consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP, for a period of one year after he resumes practice
                  following the suspension of his certificate of registration described in
                  paragraph 3, for the purpose of monitoring his compliance with the terms
                  of this Order; and

                  i)    Dr. Hui shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                        implementing the terms of this Order.
                  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Apr 2016
Summary:

On April 28, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found 
that Dr. Creighton Hui committed an act of professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health 
profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Hui committed an act of professional 
misconduct that would, in the opinion of the Committee, be an act of professional misconduct as defined 
under Ontario legislation. 

BACKGROUND 

Dr. Creighton Hui has practised emergency medicine at a hospital in Ontario since February 2012. Prior 
to that, Dr. Hui lived in Manitoba for a fellowship in emergency medicine.  

In August 2010, Dr. Hui began seeing patients at Clinic A in Manitoba and providing house calls.  

Between April 2011 and January 2012, Dr. Hui entered into an arrangement with a nurse practitioner 
from Clinic; the nurse practitioner would make house call visits to patients which would be billed to 
Manitoba Health in Dr. Hui’s name.  

The nurse practitioner proposed that Dr. Hui could attend house call visits via live video stream. While 
Dr. Hui did attend some house call visits by live video stream, he did not attend all of them. 

For these visits described above, the nurse practitioner would enter Dr. Hui’s user identifier and password 
in the electronic medical record. It was therefore unclear from the medical record that Dr. Hui had not 
personally attended the patient or made the entry. 

To facilitate this arrangement, Dr. Hui gave the nurse practitioner his password for the electronic medical 
record system so that the nurse practitioner could sign on and make chart entries under Dr. Hui’s name. 
This was done in spite of the fact that the nurse practitioner had his own user identifier and password, 
could have made entries under his own name, and could have written prescriptions under his own name. 

Between April 2011 and January 2012, Manitoba Health was billed approximately $201,223.00 for house 
call services provided by the nurse practitioner and billed in the name of Dr. Hui. Dr. Hui ultimately 
voluntarily repaid the entire $201,223.00 to Manitoba Health. 

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba (the “CPSM”) commenced an investigation of Dr. 
Hui in February 2012. During the investigation, Dr. Hui made a number of statements to the CPSM that 
he subsequently admitted were not true, for example that he supervised all patient visits by the nurse 
practitioner via live video link as well as that he subsequently reviewed all of the nurse practitioner’s 
chart entries.  
Dr. Hui subsequently admitted that he was not always present on the video link system; that he believed 
he should have been present on the video link system to comply with Manitoba Health’s fee guideline; 
that he did not always review the nurse practitioner’s chart entries; and that he never left the hospital 
when he may have been required on an urgent basis. 

An Inquiry Panel of the CPSM held proceedings regarding Dr. Hui’s conduct and found that Dr. Hui had 
committed acts of professional misconduct. Because Dr. Hui was not licensed to practice in Manitoba at 
the time of the hearing, the penalty ordered by the CPSM Inquiry Panel was a reprimand, a fine of 
$10,000 in lieu of a period of suspension, costs of $28,160.25 payable to the CPSM, and publication of 
Dr. Hui’s name and the Inquiry Panel’s decision. 

Dr. Hui cooperated with the Ontario College’s investigation into his conduct in Manitoba. 

 

PENALTY AND COSTS 

Having stated the findings in paragraph 1 of its written order of April 28, 2016, on the matter of penalty 
and costs, the Committee ordered and directed that:  
   2. The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Hui to attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   3. The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Hui’s certificate of registration 
      for a period of five (5) months, commencing from May 29, 2016 at 12:01 a.m.  
   4. The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and 
      limitations on Dr. Hui’s certificate of registration: 
         a. Dr. Hui will participate in and successfully complete, within 6 months of the date of this 
            Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics with an instructor approved by the 
            College, with a report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr. Hui’s 
            progress and compliance;  
         b. For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the suspension of his 
            certificate of registration described in paragraph 3, Dr. Hui will, at his own expense, 
            retain a practice monitor approved by the College who will sign an undertaking in the 
            form attached hereto as Schedule “A” (the “Practice Monitor”) to review Dr. Hui’s 
            Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) billings and the corresponding patient records to 
            ensure his compliance with the Health Insurance Act, as follows: 
               i. In respect of Dr. Hui’s Emergency Medicine practice, the Practice Monitor will 
                  review once every month Dr. Hui’s ER triage records and the associated billings 
         submitted to OHIP for a minimum of ten percent (10%) of Dr. Hui’s patient 
         encounters; 
      ii. In respect of any house call practice of Dr. Hui during the one-year period of 
         monitoring, Dr. Hui will notify the College if he resumes providing house calls, 
         in which case the Practice Monitor will review once every month Dr. Hui’s 
         patient records and the associated billings submitted to OHIP for a minimum of 
         twenty-five percent (25%) of Dr. Hui’s patient encounters or, if Dr. Hui’s house 
         call practice volume is greater than a volume of approximately 30-50 patients per 
         month, a reasonable number or percentage of patient records to be determined by 
         the College based on the volume of Dr. Hui’s house call practice when resumed; 
     iii. In respect of any other practice of Dr. Hui during the one-year period of 
         monitoring, Dr. Hui will notify the College prior to commencing such practice 
         and the Practice Monitor will review once every month a reasonable number or 
         percentage of Dr. Hui’s patient records and associated billings submitted to OHIP 
         in respect of this practice, with the number or percentage of patient records to be 
         determined by the College based on the volume of this practice once known;   
     iv. The Practice Monitor will be solely responsible for randomly selecting the 
         patient records to be reviewed in accordance with paragraph 4b of this Order; 
      v. Dr. Hui shall provide his Practice Monitor with his monthly OHIP reconciliation 
         from all Practice Locations, as defined below, and the Practice Monitor shall 
         review the reconciliation; 
c. If a Practice Monitor who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order is 
   unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Hui shall, within twenty (20) days 
   of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a 
   similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered 
   to the College within that time; 
d. If Dr. Hui is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor in accordance with the terms of this 
   Order, he shall cease to remit billings to OHIP until such time as he has done so; 
e. Dr. Hui shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor to the College, and by the 
   College to his Practice Monitor, of all information the Practice Monitor or the College 
   deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Practice Monitor’s undertaking and to 
   monitor Dr. Hui’s compliance with this Order; 
f. For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the suspension of his 
   certificate of registration described in paragraph 3, Dr. Hui shall inform the College of 
         each and every location where he practices including, but not limited to hospitals, clinics, 
         and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen 
         (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice 
         Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that location, for the purposes of 
         monitoring his compliance with this Order; 
      g. For a period of one year after he resumes practice following the suspension of his 
         certificate of registration described in paragraph 3, Dr. Hui shall submit to, and not 
         interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Location(s) and patient records by 
         a College representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order; 
      h. Dr. Hui shall provide consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, for a 
         period of one year after he resumes practice following the suspension of his certificate of 
         registration described in paragraph 3, for the purpose of monitoring his compliance with 
         the terms of this Order; and 
      i. Dr. Hui shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms 
         of this Order. 
5. The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Hui to pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,000, 
   within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 28, 2016