Hui, Dini (CPSO#: 78011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 168
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dini Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hui ( CPSO# 78011 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital Sciences Centre
Room M4-168
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINI HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2009 to 15 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2007