Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hui, Gavin (CPSO#: 62136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6990 Derry Road
Suite 202
Milton ON  L9T 7H3
Phone: (905) 878-4556
Fax: (905) 878-4296
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gavin Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hui ( CPSO# 62136 )

Business Address:
202 - 6990 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H3
Phone Number: (905) 878-4556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVIN HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991