Hui, Jane Yuet Ching (CPSO#: 88910)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013